Case: 01-09-01015-CR
01-09-01015-CR
11/10/2009
Terroristic Threat
James Dean Martin
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
05/20/2010 | Anders brief filed | Attorney | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/31/2011 | Mandate issued | | |||||
03/03/2011 | Corrected judgment | | |||||
02/04/2011 | Motion for rehearing due | | |||||
01/20/2011 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirm TC judgment |
| ||||
01/20/2011 | Judgment Issued | | |||||
01/20/2011 | Motion to withdraw attorney disposed | Grant motion | | ||||
01/14/2011 | Submitted | | |||||
12/23/2010 | Set for submission on briefs | | |||||
11/03/2010 | State brief due | | |||||
10/07/2010 | Anders response due | | |||||
10/06/2010 | Response filed | | |||||
10/04/2010 | Response filed | | |||||
09/22/2010 | Motion for extension of time to file pro se response disposed | Grant motion | | ||||
09/07/2010 | Anders response due | | |||||
09/02/2010 | Motion for extension of time to file Anders response filed | | |||||
07/09/2010 | Motion for extension of time to file Anders response disposed | Grant motion | | ||||
07/05/2010 | Anders response due | | |||||
06/28/2010 | Motion for extension of time to file Anders response filed | | |||||
06/02/2010 | Motion for extension of time to file Anders response disposed | Grant motion | | ||||
06/02/2010 | Motion to withdraw attorney disposed | Motion will be taken with case | | ||||
05/27/2010 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Grant motion | | ||||
05/20/2010 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
05/20/2010 | Motion to withdraw attorney filed | | |||||
05/20/2010 | Motion for extension of time to file Anders response filed | | |||||
05/20/2010 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
05/20/2010 | Anders brief filed | | |||||
05/03/2010 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
04/21/2010 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Grant motion to extend time; absent extraordinary circumstances, Court will not grant additional motions to extend time | | ||||
04/05/2010 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
04/02/2010 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
03/05/2010 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Grant motion | | ||||
03/02/2010 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
03/01/2010 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
02/02/2010 | Record due | | |||||
01/28/2010 | Reporters record filed | | |||||
01/15/2010 | Clerks record filed | | |||||
11/10/2009 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||||
11/10/2009 | Notice of appeal received | | |||||
11/02/2009 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court | | |||||
10/02/2009 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
10/02/2009 | Sentence imposed in the trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/30/2036 | Retention | Date criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate) |
05/30/2011 | Retention | Strip file 60 days after issuance of mandate |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Martin, James Dean | Criminal - Appellant | James Dean Martin Kelly W. Case |
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | B. Warren Goodson Jr. Kurt Sistrunk |
Trial Court Information
405th District Court
Galveston
Honorable Wayne J. Mallia
09CR2573
265 Days County Jail