judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MIRANDA (DAVID) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36233
Short Caption:MIRANDA (DAVID) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 35750
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C159430Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/08/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/08/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-09699
06/19/2000Order/CounselFiled Order/Fast Track/Counsel. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper person.This appeal is governed by NRAP 3C. Attorney Drew Christensen shall file the transcript request form within 10 days and a fast track statement within 40 days. Thereafter, this appeal shall proceed in accordance with the provisions of NRAP 3C. 00-10462
06/30/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 9/30/00, 3/13/00 and 5/16/00. Court Reporters: Mary Beth Cook and Lisa Makowski. Filed in district court on: June 29, 2000. 00-11175
07/10/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: March 13, 2000, May 16, 2000, and September 30, 1999 (8:30 a.m. and 10:00 a.m.). Court Reporter: Mary Beth Cook. 00-11748
07/26/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement due: on or before August 7, 2000. 00-12923
08/08/2000MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File 18 Page Fast Track Statement. 00-13711
08/11/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. On August 8, 2000, counsel for appellant filed a motion for leave to file a fast track statement in excess of 10 pages. The clerk of this court shall file, forthwith, the fast track statement provisionally submitted on August 8, 2000. 00-14046
08/11/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 00-13712
08/11/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 00-13714
08/21/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-14662
09/19/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP00A-CY/WM/NB 00-16523
10/17/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-16564
10/17/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/29/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 19, 2000. 00-16564