judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WILLIAM M. ADDISION and ARLINE N. ADDISON v. TESSA DALLAROSA-HANDRICH and DYLAN DALLAROSA-HANDRICH, Co-Administrators of the Estate of Eldon M. Handrich; and BRENT PRUNTY, Administrator of the Estate of Margaret Handrich

Case Heading (06-274)
Case Number:06-274Case Docketed On:12/01/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Property
Short Title:WILLIAM M. ADDISION and ARLINE N. ADDISON v. TESSA DALLAROSA-HANDRICH and DYLAN DALLAROSA-HANDRICH, Co-Administrators of the Estate of Eldon M. Handrich; and BRENT PRUNTY, Administrator of the Estate of Margaret Handrich
Full Title:WILLIAM M. ADDISON and ARLINE N. ADDISON, husband and wife, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. TESSA DALLAROSA-HANDRICH and DYLAN DALLAROSA-HANDRICH, Co-Administrators of the Estate of Eldon M. Handrich; and BRENT PRUNTY, Administrator of the Estate of Margaret Handrich, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantWilliam M. AddisonFrank J. Jones
AppellantArline N. AddisonFrank J. Jones
AppelleeTessa Dallarosa-HandrichGreg Weisz
AppelleeDylan Dallarosa-HandrichGreg Weisz
AppelleeBrent PruntyGreg Weisz

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 110
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/01/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/01/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/01/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
12/01/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/14/2006Notice-Incoming - Suggestion of death - notification of death of parties Eldon M. Handrich and Margaret R. Handrich, appellees.Notice-IncomingSuggestion of deathFinal
01/16/2007Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/01/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy disk and copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
03/09/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
03/19/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/20/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
03/23/2007Notice-Incoming - Filing of recordNotice-IncomingFiling of recordFinal
03/23/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes: Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcripts; Volume III, exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/23/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
03/26/2007Motion - Substitution of parties (Co-Administrators of the Estates of Handrich)MotionSubstitution of partyFinal
03/27/2007Order - Substitution of parties (Administrators of Estates of appellees); and changed caption accordingly.OrderSubstitution of partyFinal
07/17/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Kite writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/02/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/02/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
08/02/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/02/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/06/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 8/3/07 by C. Roybal.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal