judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JEROME BOWMMAN V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 10-CT-0813
Short Caption:JEROME BOWMMAN V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Criminal - DC - Traffic
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CTF13336-08Filed Date:06/25/2010

Opening Event Date:06/25/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/29/2010
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJerome Bowmman Y
AppelleeDistrict of ColumbiaN
Rosalyn Calbert GroceNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/25/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/20/2010 ORDERED that appellant shall, W/N 20 days from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this apppeal should not be dismissed for LACK OF JURISDICTION for having been taken from a Magistrate Judge W/O first having sought review... (BY: ETW)
07/20/2010TMC - OTSC
09/07/2010 ORDERED that this appeal is hereby DISMISSED FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION. See DC Code 11-1732 (k)(2001). (KRSTFA) (rm)
09/07/2010DISMISSED
09/29/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/18/2014FiledArchived