judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN REGARD TO THE PROPERTY IN THE CUSTODY OF THE GILLETTE POLICE DEPARTMENT; NAMELY, 330 PIECES OF DRUG PARAPHERNALIA (JEFFREY WAYNE DOLES, d/b/a HIP HOP HIPPIES): JEFFREY WAYNE DOLES v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0002)
Case Number:S-07-0002Case Docketed On:01/02/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Public Health and Safety (Title 35)
Short Title:IN REGARD TO THE PROPERTY IN THE CUSTODY OF THE GILLETTE POLICE DEPARTMENT; NAMELY, 330 PIECES OF DRUG PARAPHERNALIA (JEFFREY WAYNE DOLES, d/b/a HIP HOP HIPPIES): JEFFREY WAYNE DOLES v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:IN REGARD TO THE PROPERTY IN THE CUSTODY OF THE GILLETTE POLICE DEPARTMENT; NAMELY, 330 PIECES OF DRUG PARAPHERNALIA (JEFFREY WAYNE DOLES, d/b/a HIP HOP HIPPIES): JEFFREY WAYNE DOLES, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJeffrey Wayne DolesNicholas H. Carter
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
David L. Delicath

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 119
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/02/2007Event - Docketed and indexed.EventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/02/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court.Notice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/02/2007Fees - Docket fee received.FeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/02/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter.Notice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/14/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellant - FAX.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/15/2007Order - Grant - extension of time to file brief of appellant.OrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/20/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellant - original.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/26/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief - appellant - FAX.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/26/2007Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellant.OrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/27/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellant - original.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/27/2007Brief - Appellant.BriefAppellantFinal
03/21/2007Brief - Appellee; and received copy of brief on disk and designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
03/28/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendation.Notice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
04/09/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/11/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
04/16/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/31/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal orderOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/16/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/16/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/16/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/22/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 8/20/07 by Donna Elkins.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal