judyrecords
search tips
700 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MICHAEL R. HOCKMAN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 79-CF-1006
Short Caption:MICHAEL R. HOCKMAN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Lead:79-CF-1006Consolidated: 85-CF-0722
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:102591-77Filed Date:09/28/1979

Opening Event Date:09/28/1979Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/08/1980Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/18/1986
Argued/Submitted:06/11/1986
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMichael R. Hockman N
James W. KleinNY
AppellantJohn Doe N
Mark J. Rochon YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Mary A. Incontro YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HOCKMAN, MICHAEL R. UNITED STATES
09/28/1979FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/08/1980FiledRecord Completed
02/18/1986FiledBriefing Completed
06/11/1986FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/04/1986FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition