judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

EDDINS VS. EDDINS

Case Information: 34604
Short Caption:EDDINS VS. EDDINSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D234905Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/15/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/02/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Robert Eddins-check no. 0306.
08/02/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07074
08/16/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Original record due: 30 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 99-07599
09/15/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. 99-08732
09/15/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
11/18/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 99-11498
12/14/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal. 99-12587
12/14/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/03/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 20, 1999. 99-12587