judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LOWER (PHILIP) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36218
Short Caption:LOWER (PHILIP) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR970813Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/06/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/05/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/05/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-09363
07/10/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. This court hereby directs the attorney general to obtain and transmit to the clerk of this court, within 30 days from the date of this order, certified copies of any available prison records indicating the actual date upon which appellant delivered his notice of appeal to a prison official. If the prison records do not indicate that appellant delivered his notice of appeal to a prison official, the attorney general shall so inform this court. 00-11664
08/08/2000MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Response to Court's Order filed July 10, 2000. 00-13764
08/31/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Having reviewed the response of the attorney general to this court's July 10, 2000 order, this court concludes that this appeal may proceed. Record due: 120 days. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 00-15408
09/06/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Mailed on 09/05/00. 00-15662
09/06/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
02/08/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Fn4[Although Lower has not been granted permission to file documents in this matter in proper person, see NRAP 46(b), we have received and considered his proper person documents.] - NNP02-MS/RR/NB. 02-02605
03/05/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-02752
03/05/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/18/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 11, 2002. 02-02752