judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MARK NICHOLAS JAVORINA v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0103)
Case Number:S-07-0103Case Docketed On:05/09/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:MARK NICHOLAS JAVORINA v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:MARK NICHOLAS JAVORINA, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMark Nicholas JavorinaDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Jury Instructions, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 35
Citation:180 P.3d 205

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/09/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/09/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/09/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/26/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk and designation of record on appealBriefAppellantFinal
08/08/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
08/14/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
08/16/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting, Leda Pojman on behalf of appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/20/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Tina KerinNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/27/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/10/2007Event - Oral argument presented at Star Valley High School, Afton, WY. Argued before full court (Tina N. Kerin, Appellate Counsel for appellant; Leda M. Pojman, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
09/11/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, five volumes. Volumes I-IV, original papers; Volume V, transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/11/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
09/11/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
01/17/2008Correspondence - Incoming - received letter from appellant regarding his conviction for larceny, but not for concealing stolen property.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
01/18/2008Correspondence - Outgoing - sent response to appellant and returned his documents per his request.CorrespondenceOutgoingFinal
04/01/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing. Justice Hill writing for the court. Justice Burke files a special concurrence.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/02/2008Motion - Other - motion to withdraw record on appealMotionOtherFinal
04/02/2008Order - Granting motion to withdraw recordOrderGrantFinal
04/15/2008Record - Other - record on appeal returned from Public DefenderRecordOtherFinal
04/17/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/17/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/17/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/17/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/23/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 4/21/08 by E. Johnson.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal