judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: LUCILLE SAUNDRA WHITE

Case Information: 10-BG-0795
Short Caption:IN RE: LUCILLE SAUNDRA WHITEClassification:Bar Governance - Bar - Disciplinary Original
Lead: 09-BG-1012 Consolidated:10-BG-0795
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:BDN169-06Filed Date:07/01/2010

Opening Event Date:07/01/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/04/2010
Argued/Submitted:10/26/2010
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerBar CounselN
Wallace E. Shipp NN
Julia L. PorterNY
PetitionerBoard on Professional ResponsibilityN
Charles J. WilloughbyNN
RespondentLucille Saundra White NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/01/2010REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF BOARD ON PROF. RESP. that respondent be disbarred.
07/21/2010LETTER from the Office of Bar Counsel taking no exception to the report and recommendation of the Board on Professional Responsibility.
07/21/2010PETITIONER'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION to consolidate case no. 09-BG-1012 with case no. 10-BG-795.
07/28/2010RECEIVED an amended report and recommendation of the Board on Professional Responsibility.
08/04/2010ORDER On consideration of Bar Counsel's motion to consolidate for the court's consideration the two reports of the Board on Professional Responsibility concerning respondent Lucille Saundra White, and there appearing to be no opposition thereto, and it appearing that these matters are ready for consideration before a merits division, it is ORDERED that Bar Counsel's motion is granted and case nos. 09-BG-1012 and 10 BG-795 are hereby consolidated for all purposes herein. It is FURTHER ORDERED that these matters shall be scheduled for consideration on the regular calendar before a merits division as soon as the calendar permits. (JAC)
08/04/2010BRIEFS COMPLETED
08/04/2010FINAL SCREENING - REGULAR CALENDAR
08/25/2010CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
09/30/2010LETTER from the Office of Bar Counsel advising the Court that Bar Counsel is willing to submit the two matters for decision based on the Board's report as well as Bar Counsel's brief. If the Court wishes to have argument, Bar Counsel will appear on October 26, 2010.
10/19/2010ORDER - On consideration of Bar Counsel's letter indicating his willingness to submit the two matters for decision without oral argument, and it appearing that these matters are scheduled on the Regular Calendar of October 26, 2010, it is ORDERED on behalf of the merits division assigned to consider these matters that they will be submitted for consideration and decision on October 26,2010, on the record and brief filed without oral argument by any party. (JC)
10/26/2010FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/26/2010RESPONDENT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION (Emergency) to continue oral argument
10/26/2010SUBMITTED
10/29/2010PETITIONER'S OPPOSITION to respondent's emergency motion to continue oral arguments. (Bar Counsel)
11/09/2010On consideration of respondent's emergency motion to continue oral arguments and Bar Counsel's opposition thereto, it is ORDERED that the motion is denied and this matter remains submitted for consideration and decision on October 26, 2010 pursuant to this court's order of October 19, 2010. (KR,OB,BE)
01/20/2011DISBARMENT ORDERED that Lucille Saundra White is disbarred from the practice of law in the District of Columbia, effective thirty days from the date of this opinion. See D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14 (f). Respondent shall not be eligible for reinstatement for five years from the effective date of disbarment, pursuant to D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 16 (a). (KR,OB,BE)
03/07/2011RECEIVED from the Office of Bar Counsel a notice of nonfiling by respondent the required affidavit pursuant to D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 14.
04/27/2011RECEIVED from the Supreme Court of the United States notification that respondent has filed a writ of certiorari against the Board on April 20, 2011 and placed on the docket April 21, 2011 as No. 10-1287.
06/02/2011NOTICE OF DENIAL OF PET. FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI