judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STEWART (ALEX) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36217
Short Caption:STEWART (ALEX) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C163480Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/05/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/05/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-09360
06/19/2000Order/CounselFiled Order/Fast Track/Counsel. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper person.This appeal is governed by NRAP 3C. Attorney Terrence M. Jackson shall file the transcript request form within 10 days and a fast track statement within 40 days. Thereafter, this appeal shall proceed in accordance with the provisions of NRAP 3C. 00-10451
07/03/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: March 3, 2000 and April 26, 2000. Court Reporter: Tina Smith. Filed in district court on: June 30, 2000. 00-11270
08/04/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 00-13559
08/04/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 00-13560
08/18/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-14424
08/28/2000Order/Procedural Order. Court reporter Smith shall deliver certified copies of the requested rough draft transcripts to the clerk of this court within 10 days of the date of this order or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. 00-15003
09/05/2000TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: March 3, 2000 and April 26, 2000. Court Reporter: Tina B. Smith. 00-15543
10/02/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[There has been no evidentiary hearing in this case, so any claim of ineffective assistance of counsel is more appropriately raised in a post-conviction proceeding.] SNP00A-CY/WM/NB 00-17319
10/31/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-17444
10/31/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/04/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 13, 2000. 00-17444