judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MARC A. LOCKWOOD v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0102)
Parent: S-07-0101 Case Docketed On:05/09/2007
Consolidated:S-07-0102
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:MARC A. LOCKWOOD v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:MARC A. LOCKWOOD, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMarc A. LockwoodR. Michael Vang
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
James Michael Causey

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 190
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/09/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/09/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/09/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/09/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/04/2007Motion - Consolidate with S-07-0101MotionConsolidateFinal
06/05/2007Order - Consolidating casesOrderConsolidating casesFinal
06/25/2007Brief - Appellant; and received copy of brief on diskBriefAppellantFinal
08/08/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
08/14/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
08/15/2007Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
08/16/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting, James Michael Causey on behalf of appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/17/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - R. Michael Vang for appellants.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/27/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/05/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, four volumes, two for each appellant. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcripts & confidential folder (Melissa Garvin); Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcripts & confidential folder (Marc A. Lockwood). Note: Exhibit #1 (video tape) not included with record for Melissa Garvin, see note from Court Reporter attached to record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/05/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
09/10/2007Event - Oral argument presented at Star Valley High School, Afton, WY - Argued before full court (R. Michael Vang for appellant; James Michael Causey, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
09/11/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
12/06/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Golden writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/26/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/26/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/26/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/26/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/28/2007Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal