judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JULIA PERGOLA V. D.C. DEP'T OF PUBLIC WORKS

Case Information: 10-AA-0794
Short Caption:JULIA PERGOLA V. D.C. DEP'T OF PUBLIC WORKSClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - OAH - Public Works
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DPW02672-10Filed Date:07/02/2010

Opening Event Date:07/02/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/26/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerJulia Pergola NPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Department of Public WorksN
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/02/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW (RECVD ONLY). Held in Abeyance
07/02/2010PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
07/15/2010ORDER DENY PTNR MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and petitioner is hereby direct to tender the $100 fee within 10 calendar days from the date of this order. Failure to comply with this order shall result int he dismissal of this appeal. See D.C. App. R. 13. It is F/O that the lodged petitionf or review is hereby held in abeyance pending further order of this court. (ETW)
08/04/2010ORDER: This appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (By: ETW)
08/04/2010DISMISSED
08/26/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/18/2014FiledArchived