Case: 14-85-00391-CV
14-85-00391-CV
05/16/1985
Contract
First National Bank of Bryan
Peterson, Frederick E.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/28/2011 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
08/22/1986 | Mandate Issued | | |
06/04/1986 | Writ of Error FILED | | |
05/30/1986 | Writ of Error FILED | | |
05/01/1986 | Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STA | OVERRULED | |
04/03/1986 | Motion for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,REL,RES,STA | | |
03/20/1986 | Opinion issued | AFFIRMED | |
11/21/1985 | Submission | | |
09/30/1985 | Case ready to be set | | |
08/29/1985 | Mtn.to supplement transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APE,STA | GRANTED | |
08/29/1985 | No description available. | | |
08/15/1985 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | MOOT | |
08/12/1985 | Mtn.to supplement transcript FILED-ANT,APE,STA | | |
08/12/1985 | Supplemental transcript RECEIVED - ANT,APE,STA | | |
08/09/1985 | AM CUR, OTHER, | | |
08/09/1985 | Brief RECEIVED - ANT,APP,PRO,STA | | |
07/29/1985 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
07/26/1985 | Response to Motion FILED-ANT,APE,APP,RES,STA | | |
07/25/1985 | AM CUR, OTHER, | | |
07/25/1985 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
07/16/1985 | Writ of Error DISPOSED | | |
07/08/1985 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
07/05/1985 | Brief RECEIVED - ANT,APP,PRO,STA | | |
05/16/1985 | Letter from atty with address change | | |
05/16/1985 | Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP | | |
05/16/1985 | Transcript FILED | | |
02/14/1985 | No description available. | | |
02/05/1985 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/22/1986 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Appellee | S. Lee Stevenson, Jr. |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Appellant | Hon. John K. Schwartz |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Appellant | Jon Miller |
Trial Court Information
11th District Court
Harris
83-31751B