judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CITY LAUNDRY & CLEANERS VS. DE LUCA

Case Information: 34719
Short Caption:CITY LAUNDRY & CLEANERS VS. DE LUCACourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A331413Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:BeckerCase Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/03/1999 / Smith, JaySP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/26/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Becker. Sat in district court proceedings.
08/26/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
08/26/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07969
08/26/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
08/26/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
09/03/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Jay Earl Smith. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/03/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: 8/31/99. 99-08306
09/03/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Fitzgibbons & Anderson--check no. 47215.
09/09/1999MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Motion to Dismiss and for Attorneys Fees and Costs. 99-08488
09/15/1999MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. 99-08720
09/21/1999Other Returned Unfiled Document. Returned, with letter, Respondent's Reply to Appellants' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. Pursuant to NRAP 27(a).
09/24/1999MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation to Dismiss Appeal as to Respondents Paul De Luca, Individually, and Paul De Luca Construction Co. 99-09128
10/11/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 99-09807
10/11/1999Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 99-09808
10/29/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. fn1[Respondents' motion to dismiss appeal filed on September 9, 1999, is denied as moot]. SNP/CLK 99-10602
10/29/1999Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.