judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CONNIE PLYMALE, f/k/a CONNIE DONNELLY v. GAVIN DONNELLY

Case Heading (06-219)
Case Number:06-219Case Docketed On:09/25/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:CONNIE PLYMALE, f/k/a CONNIE DONNELLY v. GAVIN DONNELLY
Full Title:CONNIE PLYMALE, f/k/a CONNIE DONNELLY, Appellant (Defendant), v. GAVIN DONNELLY, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantConnie PlymalePatrick M. Hunter
AppelleeGavin DonnellyDevon P. O'Connell

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 81
Citation:157 P.3d 933

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/25/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/25/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
09/25/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/25/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/25/2006Order - Sanction - notice of appealOrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
09/27/2006Notice-Incoming - Other - received copy of notice of appeal FedX from counsel for appellant - sent 9/26/06.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
09/29/2006Correspondence - Incoming other - received docketing letter sent to counsel for appellant - forward time expired. Resent this date.CorrespondenceIncoming otherFinal
10/03/2006Order - Rescinding sanctionOrderRescinding sanctionFinal
10/31/2006Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk and designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
12/18/2006Brief - Appellee; received copy on disk and copy of designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
12/21/2006Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
12/28/2006Brief - Appellant reply; and received copy of brief on disk.BriefAppellant replyFinal
01/04/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
01/04/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/08/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal: Volume I, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/08/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
05/11/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding. Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/30/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/30/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/30/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/01/2007Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal