judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DULCIE C. WRIGHT v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (06-223)
Case Number:06-223Case Docketed On:09/26/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Sheridan CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:DULCIE C. WRIGHT v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:DULCIE C. WRIGHT, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDulcie C. WrightBarbara A. Baker
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionPatrick J. Crank
John William Renneisen
Steven R. Czoschke
Kristi Marie Radosevich

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 101
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/29/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/29/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/29/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/29/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/03/2006Brief - Appellant; and received copy on disk.BriefAppellantFinal
12/19/2006Brief - Appellee; and received copy on disk. Received copy of designation of record on appeal on 12/20/06BriefAppelleeFinal
12/22/2006Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
01/04/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
01/08/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/12/2007Notice-Incoming - Filing of recordNotice-IncomingFiling of recordFinal
01/12/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes: Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcript; Volume III, agency record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/12/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
06/21/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Golden writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/29/2007Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
07/17/2007Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
07/17/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/17/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/17/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/19/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for on 7/18/07 by Nate Anderson.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal