judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ESTATE OF RAY VS. ENGELKE

Case Information: 34720
Short Caption:ESTATE OF RAY VS. ENGELKECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A389693Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/03/1999 / Robinson, DavidSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/09/2000How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/26/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Nevada General Insurance Co.--check no. 126444.
08/26/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07970
09/03/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: David K. Robinson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/01/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-09463
11/04/1999Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to file a docketing statement and to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 99-10810
11/22/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. June 12, 1999 Transcripts requested: To Court Reporter: Carrie Hansen. 99-11631
11/22/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-11632
12/09/1999Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 99-12386
03/07/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 3/3/00. 00-03588
03/07/2000AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 and 2. 00-03591
04/03/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 3/31/00. 00-05283
05/01/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 4/26/00. 00-07051
06/06/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted as of the date of this order, on the record and briefs filed herein. 00-09473
06/06/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
10/09/2000Case Status Update Resubmitted for Decision. Panel: SNP00A-CY/WM/NB.
12/07/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. We conclude that the district court erred in striking the request for trial de novo. " . . . the order of the district court is reversed, and this matter is remanded for further proceedings consistent with this order." SNP00A-CY/WM/NB 00-21415
01/03/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-21537
01/03/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/20/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 9, 2001. 00-21537