Case: 05-84-00981-CV
05-84-00981-CV
09/14/1984
Divorce
Michele Rena Hatfield & Jessica Michele Hatfield
Wayne Hatfield
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
07/08/2019 | Order entered | Destroy | | ||
04/12/2019 | Retention time case file will be retained | Destroy | | ||
09/07/2018 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||
07/08/1985 | Mandate Issued | | |||
05/13/1985 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | | ||
04/11/1985 | Submitted | | |||
03/12/1985 | Motion to File Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
03/07/1985 | MattConv | | |||
03/07/1985 | Supplemental Brief Filed | | |||
02/26/1985 | MattConv | | |||
01/07/1985 | Mot Ext Time Sup Sfacts Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
01/04/1985 | Motion to Strike Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
12/27/1984 | Brief Filed | | |||
12/21/1984 | Response to Motion | | |||
12/21/1984 | Supplemental Statement of Facts Filed | | |||
12/14/1984 | MattConv | | |||
11/30/1984 | Brief Filed | | |||
11/21/1984 | Supplemental Transcript filed | | |||
11/14/1984 | Exhibits Filed | | |||
11/14/1984 | Supplemental Statement of Facts Filed | | |||
11/02/1984 | Mot Ext Time Sup Sfacts Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
11/01/1984 | MattConv | | |||
10/30/1984 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
10/29/1984 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
10/23/1984 | Letter Sent by the Court | | |||
10/18/1984 | Mot Ext Time File Sup Sfacts | | |||
10/05/1984 | Exhibits Filed | | |||
10/05/1984 | Mot for Ext Stat of Facts Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
10/05/1984 | Mot for Ext Transcript Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
10/05/1984 | Motion - Ext to File Bond Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
10/05/1984 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |||
10/05/1984 | Transcript Filed | | |||
09/28/1984 | Response to Motion | | |||
09/21/1984 | Response to Motion | | |||
09/14/1984 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | | |||
09/14/1984 | Motion - Ext. to File Bond | | |||
06/07/1984 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/08/2019 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
196th Judicial District Court
Hunt
Honorable Hunt District Judge, 196th District Court
42,649