Case: 14-06-00478-CV
14-06-00478-CV
05/23/2006
No description available.
Texas Department of Public Safety
Jeremy Collmorgen
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
08/11/2014 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |||
07/06/2007 | Case stored | | |||
07/06/2007 | Mandate issued | | |||
06/21/2007 | Mandate due to be issued | | |||
05/28/2007 | Petition for review due in Supreme Court | | |||
04/12/2007 | Motion for rehearing overruled | OVERRULED | | ||
04/06/2007 | Motion for rehearing due | | |||
03/29/2007 | Motion fee due | | |||
03/28/2007 | Motion for rehearing filed | | |||
03/22/2007 | Memorandum opinion issued | REVERSED AND RENDERED |
| ||
01/09/2007 | Submitted | | |||
11/29/2006 | Set for submission on briefs | | |||
11/09/2006 | Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |||
11/09/2006 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | Extension of time to file GRANTED and document received is ordered filed | | ||
11/09/2006 | Case ready to be set | | |||
11/07/2006 | Fee of $10 is now due on civil motions FILED. | | |||
11/06/2006 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |||
11/02/2006 | Brf.RECD.No Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA, | | |||
10/31/2006 | Appellee's brief DUE | | |||
10/05/2006 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | | ||
09/28/2006 | Fee of $10 is now due on civil motions FILED. | | |||
09/28/2006 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |||
09/27/2006 | Response due | | |||
09/12/2006 | Past due brief | | |||
09/04/2006 | Appellee's brief DUE | | |||
08/03/2006 | Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |||
08/03/2006 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | Extension of time to file GRANTED and document received is ordered filed | | ||
08/02/2006 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |||
08/02/2006 | Brf.RECD.ARGU.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA | | |||
07/20/2006 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |||
06/20/2006 | Reporters record FILED - ANT,APP,STA | | |||
06/19/2006 | Reporter's Record Due | | |||
06/14/2006 | Reporters record FILED - ANT,APP,STA | | |||
06/12/2006 | Clerk's record FILED - APP,STA | | |||
05/30/2006 | Mediation Docketing Statement FILED | | |||
05/25/2006 | Clerk's NOA Filed | | |||
05/25/2006 | Notice for Docketing Statement FILED | | |||
05/23/2006 | Letter RECEIVED | | |||
05/23/2006 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||
05/22/2006 | Docketing Statement FILED | | |||
05/19/2006 | Notice of Appeal FILED - APP | | |||
04/20/2006 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | | |||
03/23/2006 | Motion for new trial FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/11/2014 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Texas Department of Public Safety | Appellant | J. Francis Davis |
Collmorgen, Jeremy | Appellee | Albert M. McCaig, Jr. |
Trial Court Information
9th District Court
Waller
Honorable Frederick Edwards
05-06-17870