Case: 08-06-00157-CR
08-06-00157-CR
06/12/2006
Murder
Oscar Ricardo Tovar
The State of Texas
No
5th Court of Appeals
06/12/2006
05-06-00656-CR
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
07/18/2007 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | State | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
09/02/2008 | Mandate issued | | |||||
06/09/2008 | Letter filed | | |||||
05/22/2008 | Opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||
04/24/2008 | Submitted | | |||||
03/17/2008 | Set for submission on oral argument | | |||||
07/18/2007 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
07/18/2007 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | | |||||
07/18/2007 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
07/18/2007 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
06/11/2007 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
06/11/2007 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
05/14/2007 | Brief Filed | | |||||
03/28/2007 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
03/12/2007 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
03/02/2007 | Miscellaneous filing | | |||||
02/28/2007 | Miscellaneous filing | | |||||
02/28/2007 | Order entered | | |||||
02/23/2007 | Miscellaneous filing | | |||||
12/04/2006 | Order entered | | |||||
11/13/2006 | Case ready to be set-withdrawn | | |||||
11/13/2006 | Brief Filed | | |||||
10/30/2006 | Miscellaneous filing | | |||||
10/12/2006 | Brief Filed | | |||||
10/12/2006 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
10/12/2006 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
10/05/2006 | Miscellaneous filing | | |||||
09/07/2006 | Order entered | | |||||
08/08/2006 | Letter - no brief filed. | | |||||
06/23/2006 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
06/23/2006 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
06/12/2006 | Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals | | |||||
05/24/2006 | Docketing Statement Received | | |||||
05/17/2006 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||||
05/10/2006 | Reporter/Recorder's Record filed. | | |||||
05/10/2006 | Notice of Appeal Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
09/02/2008 | Retention | Criminal case to be retained permanently (sentence over 20 years or historical value) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Tovar, Oscar Ricardo | Criminal - Appellant | Hon. John H. Hagler |
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | Hon. Amy Michelle Columbus Hon. Laura Anne Coats Hon. Craig Watkins |
Trial Court Information
291st District Court
Dallas
Honorable Susan Hawk
F04-58401-U
70 yrs IDTDCJ