Case: 08-05-00213-CR
08-05-00213-CR
06/06/2005
Habeas Corpus
Ex Parte: George Peyton Lambeth
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
05/09/2007 | Mandate Issued | | |||
04/10/2007 | Case Returned from Higher Court | | |||
04/10/2007 | Decision from Supreme Court or CCA | Refused | | ||
02/28/2007 | Decision from Supreme Court or CCA | Refused | | ||
12/13/2006 | Case Forwarded to Higher Court | | |||
12/01/2006 | Petition for Discretionary Review | | |||
11/02/2006 | Opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||
10/25/2006 | Submitted | | |||
10/04/2006 | Submission | | |||
05/18/2006 | Reply brief filed. | | |||
05/08/2006 | Case ready to be set | | |||
05/08/2006 | Brief Filed | | |||
03/15/2006 | Order entered | | |||
03/15/2006 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
03/01/2006 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |||
01/27/2006 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
01/27/2006 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |||
12/15/2005 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
12/15/2005 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |||
11/17/2005 | Brief Filed | | |||
10/20/2005 | Reporter/Recorder's Record filed. | | |||
10/20/2005 | Affidavit from Reporter Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
10/19/2005 | Affidavit from Reporter Filed | | |||
09/28/2005 | Order entered | | |||
09/28/2005 | Affidavit from Reporter Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
09/21/2005 | Affidavit from Reporter Filed | | |||
08/17/2005 | Affidavit from Reporter Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
08/10/2005 | Affidavit from Reporter Filed | | |||
06/30/2005 | supp. record filed (sup clerk/reporters record) | | |||
06/22/2005 | Affidavit from Reporter Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
06/22/2005 | Affidavit from Reporter Filed | | |||
06/21/2005 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||
06/06/2005 | Docketing Statement Received | | |||
06/06/2005 | Notice of Appeal Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/09/2007 | Case Stored | Court has determined no historical value - file to be destroyed once retention schedule has been met |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Lambeth, Ex Parte: George Peyton | Criminal - Appellant | Hon. M. Clara Hernandez Hon. Peter L. Bright Hon. Scott Segall |
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | Hon. Jaime E. Esparza Nelda F. Williams |
Trial Court Information
243rd District Court
El Paso
Honorable David Guaderrama
20040D05922