judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MELISSA L. GRAY v. JOHN W. PAVEY, a/k/a JOHNNY W. PAVEY

Case Heading (06-277)
Case Number:06-277Case Docketed On:12/04/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Converse CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:MELISSA L. GRAY v. JOHN W. PAVEY, a/k/a JOHNNY W. PAVEY
Full Title:MELISSA L. GRAY, Appellant (Respondent), JOHN W. PAVEY, a/k/a JOHNNY W. PAVEY, Appellee (Petitioner).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMelissa L. GrayCole N. Sherard
AppelleeJohn W. PaveyJames A. Hardee

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 84
Citation:158 P.3d 667

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/04/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/04/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/04/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
12/04/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/04/2006Event - Phone Call - clerk's office stated she sent notification before statement of the evidence was approved. Requested letter so that briefing schedule could be stayed pending notification again by clerk.EventPhone CallFinal
12/06/2006Notice-Incoming - Other - letter from clerk of district court stating that record is incomplete.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
12/07/2006Order - Stay briefing pending completion of recordOrderStay briefingFinal
12/29/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court - statement of the evidence has been filed.Notice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/29/2006Notice-Outgoing - Resuming briefing scheduleNotice-OutgoingResuming briefing scheduleFinal
02/12/2007Brief - Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
02/12/2007Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
03/02/2007Brief - Appellee; and received copy on disk.BriefAppelleeFinal
03/02/2007Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
03/05/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
03/12/2007Notice-Incoming - Other - Notice of submission of brief without oral argument (No action necessary, recommended for expedited docket).Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
03/19/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/20/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
03/28/2007Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
03/28/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, one volume: Volume I, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/28/2007Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/21/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/06/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/06/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
06/06/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/06/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal