Case: 03-0932
03-0932
10/13/2003
Petition for Review under Tex. R. App. P. 53.1
ALI R. ONDEMIR
OCWEN FEDERAL BANK, F/K/A BERKELEY BANK & TRUST FSB
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/02/2004 | Motion for Rehearing | Rehearing filed in Petition for Review | On behalf of Ondemir | |
11/19/2003 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | petitioner's reply to respondent's response | |
11/12/2003 | Response to Petition | Respondent | Response to petition for review filed on behalf of Ocwen Federal Bank | |
10/13/2003 | Appendix Filed | Petitioner | appendix attached to petition for review | |
10/13/2003 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | On behalf of Ali R. Ondemir | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/18/2004 | Case Stored | G02/26-D-2 | | |
02/17/2004 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | Order sent to the court of appeals. | | |
02/06/2004 | Motion for Rehearing - Disposed | Denied | | |
01/06/2004 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
01/02/2004 | Motion for Rehearing | On behalf of Ondemir | | |
12/19/2003 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | | |
11/19/2003 | Reply to Response | petitioner's reply to respondent's response | | |
11/18/2003 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
11/12/2003 | Response to Petition | Response to petition for review filed on behalf of Ocwen Federal Bank | | |
10/13/2003 | Affidavit of Inability to Pay Court Costs | affidavit of inability to pay on behalf of Ali R. Ondemir, incorporated in petition for review | | |
10/13/2003 | Appendix Filed | appendix attached to petition for review | | |
10/13/2003 | Petition for Review | On behalf of Ali R. Ondemir | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
02/18/2004 | Case Stored | Case stored. | G02/26-D-2 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
OCWEN Federal Bank, f/k/a Berkeley Bank & Trust FSB | Respondent | Ms. Clarissa Lamar Chavarria Mr. Benjamin R. Bingham |
Ondemir, Ali R. | Petitioner | Ali R. Ondemir |
Court of Appeals Information:
04-02-00721-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
___ SW3d ___, 09-10-03
4th Court of Appeals
Honorable Sarah B. Duncan
Trial Court Information
225th District Court
Bexar
Honorable Carol Haberman
1998-CI-02357