Case Information: 86-CV-1255 | |||
Short Caption: | HOKE, JOHN R. REGIONAL REDEVELOPMENT CORP. | Classification: | Appeals - Civil - Other Civil |
Lead: | 86-CV-1173 | Consolidated: | 86-CV-1255, 87-CV-0147 |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CA5280-83 | Filed Date: | 08/20/1986 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 08/20/1986 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 02/11/1987 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 06/22/1987 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 02/02/1988 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 11/22/1988 |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | HOKE, JOHN R. REGIONAL REDEVELOPMENT CORP. ET AL | |||
01/01/1903 | NOTE - 01 12/5/86 ORD: GRANT MO TO NOTE - 01 REINSTATE THIS APL; SS CONS NOTE - 02 W/86-1173; APLTS TO MAKE NEC NOTE - 02 ARRANGEMENTS TO HAVE RECORD NOTE - 03 TRANSMITTED; APLTS BRF DUE 40 NOTE - 03 DAYS AFTER RECORD IS FILED. NOTE - 04 CON: 86-1173 & 87-147 NOTE - 04 NOTE - 05 4/16/87 ORD: CONS 87-147 W/ NOTE - 05 NOS. 86-1173 & 86-1255; NOTE - 06 APLE-X-APLT TO FL A CONS BRF NOTE - 06 OF REGIONAL REDEVELOPMENT CORP NOTE - 07 W/IN 30 DAYS. NOTE - 07 NOTE - 08 01/24/89 ORD GRT APLT REQUEST NOTE - 08 FOR DUPLICATION COST IN THE NOTE - 09 AMOUNT OF $55.25 & DEN AWARD NOTE - 09 OF COST IN REF TO TRANSCRIPT NOTE - 10 W/OUT PREJUDICE TO RENEWAK IN NOTE - 10 THE TRIAL CT IN ACCORDANCE NOTE - 11 WITH RULE 39(E) APLT MAY FL NOTE - 11 FOR SUPPLEMENTAL COST UPON NOTE - 12 PRESENTATION OF SUPPORTING NOTE - 12 DATA. | |||
01/01/1905 | TRDATE- 88/02/02 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - GOLDSTEINL FOR - RRC et al. ATTY 2 - MICHALJ FOR - HOKE | |||
08/20/1986 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
10/06/1986 | ORDER APLT IN 10 DAYS OTSC WHY CASE SHLD NOT BE DISMISSED. (NO CAS & FEE) EBP PANELPY SCDATE 090486 SCHPRD CAS | |||
10/21/1986 | ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL. (VACATED BY 12/5/86 ORDER) EBP PANELPY SCDATE 101686 SCHPRD ANSA | |||
10/22/1986 | MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR REINSTATEMENT OF APPEAL GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
10/22/1986 | $50.00 DOCKETING FEE GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
10/24/1986 | $5 PAID TO DC TREASURER VS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
10/29/1986 | APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO APLT'S MOTION FOR REINSTATEMENT OF APPEAL GG PANEL SCDATE 110386 SCHPRD OPE | |||
12/05/1986 | ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03 ACG PANELPY SCDATE 112186 SCHPRD RBH | |||
12/22/1986 | RECORD ON APPEAL (EXHIBIT - 1 LARGE BROWN ENVELOPE) GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
02/02/1987 | RECEIVED APLE'S MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT RECORD WITH TRANSCIPT FILED IN SUPERIOR COURT GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
02/11/1987 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
02/11/1987 | COURT REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT (465 PGS - WHALEN) PB PANEL SCDATE 012187 SCHPRD RT | |||
03/02/1987 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF IN 86-1173 UNTIL 30 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED (CONSENT) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/25/1987 | ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE/X-APLT TO EXT TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 30 DAYS FROM DATE OF THIS ORDER SL PANELPY SCDATE 031287 SCHPRD CHECK | |||
04/16/1987 | ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 05-07. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 042487 SCHPRD BEA | |||
05/18/1987 | APPELLEE/CROSS-APPELLANT'S BRIEF OF REGIONAL REDEVELOPMENT CORP & ATTACHMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 051887 SCHPRD BEA | |||
06/22/1987 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
06/22/1987 | APPELLANT/CROSS-APPELLEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 062287 SCHPRD BAE | |||
07/13/1987 | APPELLEE'S REPLY BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
02/02/1988 | ARGUED PANELMKRGST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
09/29/1988 | AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF TRIAL COURT JDGMT PANELMKRGST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
09/29/1988 | DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -ST CITE | |||
09/29/1988 | OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - ST PAGE # - 1952 | |||
10/11/1988 | MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR AWARD OF COSTS JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
10/13/1988 | PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC OF PETITIONER'S REGIONAL REDEVELOPMENT CORPORATION RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
11/22/1988 | MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
01/24/1989 | ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS: 8-12 PB PANELROMKST SCDATE 102488 SCHPRD OPE |