judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

CITY OF SAN ANGELO, R. L. HENDERSON, EXECUTOR, C. C. MCBURNETT, C. C. MCBURNETT AND R. L. HENDERSON, EXECUTOR v. ARTHUR SITAS

Case: A-68
A-68
02/16/1944
Application for Writ of Error
CITY OF SAN ANGELO, R. L. HENDERSON, EXECUTOR, C. C. MCBURNETT, C. C. MCBURNETT AND R. L. HENDERSON, EXECUTOR
ARTHUR SITAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/10/1944Motion for RehearingRespondent
05/10/1944Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/09/1944Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/26/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
02/16/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
02/16/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
02/16/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/19/1944Response to Motion filed
05/16/1944Response to Motion filed
05/10/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/10/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/09/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/11/1944Bond
03/08/1944Document received (See Remarks)
02/26/1944Response to Petition
02/16/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
02/16/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
02/16/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
02/16/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
C. C. McBurnett and R. L. Henderson, ExecutorPetitioner
R. L. Henderson, ExecutorPetitioner
Arthur SitasRespondent
C. C. McBurnettPetitioner
CITY OF SAN ANGELOPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information