judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANTOINE ROSE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-0817
Short Caption:ANTOINE ROSE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Bribery
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-26878-09Filed Date:07/01/2010

Opening Event Date:07/01/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/25/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/22/2010
Argued/Submitted:04/26/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/07/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAntoine Rose YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Leslie Ann Gerardo YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/01/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/20/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Lisa Chanel, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
07/20/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Lisa Chanel, Esquire
08/16/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
10/04/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (513 pgs/Ramos) 4/26-29/10 proc. cd attached
10/05/2010RECORD INDEX
10/05/2010RECORD COPIES
10/20/2010RECEIVED - aplt's brief w/appdx.
10/25/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (18 pgs/tape) 4/21/09 proc. w/cd
10/25/2010RECORD COMPLETED
11/22/2010ORDERED that the appellant's lodged brief and limited appendix are filed. F/O that the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (JAC)
11/22/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
11/22/2010APPENDIX (attached to the appellant's brief)
11/22/2010APPELLEE'S BRIEF
11/22/2010BRIEFS COMPLETED
12/17/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (11 pgs/Ramos) 4/22/10 proc. w/cd
01/18/2011FINAL SCREENING - REGULAR CALENDAR
02/02/2011 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of April 2011 through June 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by FEB. 14, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
02/08/2011LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING aple
02/10/2011LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING aplt
03/02/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
04/26/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/26/2011FiledARGUED before Ruiz,Thompson,Nebeker. Lisa D.Chanel Esq.,for appellant. Leslie Ann Gerardo Esq.,for appellee.
05/12/2011AFFIRMED (MOJ) (Ruiz and Thompson, Associate Judges, and Nebeker, Senior Judge.)
05/31/2011CJA ATTORNEY'S QUALLS LETTER
06/07/2011MANDATE ISSUED
02/03/2012FiledLetter requesting appointment of counsel to file Motion to Reinstate Appeal and to Recall the Mandate From (Appellant)