judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE VENETIAN LIEN LITIGATION (NORTHWESTERN, INC.)

Case Information: 36236
Short Caption:IN RE VENETIAN LIEN LITIGATION (NORTHWESTERN, INC.)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 36029 , 36030 , 36031 , 36032 , 36033 , 36157 , 36160 , 36161 , 36162 , 36163 , 36164 , 36165 , 36166 , 36232 , 36235 , 36237 , 36238 , 36239 , 36240 , 36241 , 36242 , 36243 , 36244 , 36245 , 36246 , 36581 , 37054 , 37245 , 37527 , 37546 , 37558 , 37670 , 37713 , 37792 , 38576 , 39928 , 41163 , 41332 , 42265
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A397391
Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A409252
Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/13/2000 / Berkson, LesterSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/08/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Jones Vargas--check no. 9539.
06/08/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-09706
06/13/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
06/21/2000MotionFiled Motion for Stay. Appellants' Emergency Motion for Order to Stay Lien Foreclosure Proceedings. 00-10606
06/27/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Joint Opposition of Appellees to Appellants' Emergency Motion for Order to Stay Lien Foreclosure Proceedings. 00-10992
06/27/2000MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Motion to Dismiss Venetian Casino Resort's Improper Appeal as Void. 00-10993
06/30/2000MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulation to Extend the Time of Appellants to File Appellants' Opposition Brief to Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 00-11249
07/06/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Approving Stipulation. Appellants' Opposition to the motion to dismiss appeal shall be served and filed within 7 days from the date of this order. 00-11502
07/11/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Appellants' Opposition to Motion of Respondent Northwestern, Inc.'s to Dismiss Appeal. 00-11783
07/11/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Joinder. Joinder to Northwestern Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Venetian Casino Resort's Improper Appeal as Void. 00-11789
07/14/2000MotionFiled Motion. Harmon, Ltd.'s Joinder in Norhtwestern, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Venetian Casino Resort's Improper Appeal as Void. 00-12231
07/17/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Mailing (Joinder filed 7/11/00). 00-12302
07/20/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. for Harmon, Ltd.'s Joinder. 00-12559
07/24/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Appellants' Opposition to Harmon Ltd's Joinder in Northwestern, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 00-12729
07/24/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Appellants' Opposition to Won-Door Corporation's Joinder to Northwestern, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 00-12731
12/12/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Order Denying Motions for Stay. We are not persuaded that stays pending appeals in these cases are warranted at this time. We deny appellants' motions. Nos. 36029, 36030, 36031, 36032, 36033, 36157, 36160, 36161, 36162, 36163, 36164, 36165, 36166, 36232, 36235, 36236, 36237, 36238, 32639, 36240, 36241, 36242, 36243, 36244, 36245, 36246. 00-21714
02/14/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. Settlement Conference Status Report from Settlement Judge Berkson. It is suggested that the Supreme Court consider the determination of the pending Motion to Dismiss. As of this date, settlement conferences are continuing. Nos. 36029, 36030, 36031, 36032, 36033, 36157, 36160, 36161, 36162, 36163, 36164, 36165, 36166, 36232, 36235, 36236, 36237, 36238, 36239, 36240, 36241, 36242, 36243, 36244, 36245, 36246 and 36581 (01-02912).
03/06/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Respondents have filed motions to dismiss appellants' appeals. fn1[In Docket Nos. 36031, 36160, 36163, 36239, 36240, 36241, and 36242, respondents did not file formal motions to dismiss; instead, they filed joinders in respondent Ebenisterie Beaubois, Ltee's motion to dismiss, filed in Docket No. 36235. In all but one appeal (Docket No. 36240), appellants opposed these joinders. We construe their joinders as motions to dismiss. In Docket Nos. 36030, 36237, 36243, 36245, and 36581, respondents did not file motions to dismiss or joinders in other respondents' motions. Nevertheless, as these appeals present the same jurisdiction issues as all the other appeals, we have elected to address jurisdiction in all appeals.] As NRS 108.2275 does not authorize the instant appeals, we 'ORDER these appeals dismissed.' fn3[In light of this order, we vacate our prior notices of settlement conferences in these appeals.] NNP01A-MS/DA/RR. Nos. 36029, 36030, 36031, 36032, 36033, 36157,36160, 36161, 36162, 36163, 36164, 36165, 36166, 36232, 36235, 36236, 36237, 36238, 36239, 36240, 36241, 36242, 36243, 36244, 36245, 36246, 36581. 01-04036
04/03/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-04185
04/03/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/13/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 6, 2001. 01-04185