Case: 14-85-00536-CR
14-85-00536-CR
07/05/1985
Other Drug Possession
Martinez, Benito Salinas
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
10/14/1986 | Mandate Issued | | |
09/29/1986 | No description available. | | |
09/12/1986 | No description available. | | |
08/28/1986 | Opinion Withdrawn | | |
08/28/1986 | Substitute Opinion | AFFIRMED | |
08/28/1986 | Substitute Opinion | AFFIRMED | |
08/28/1986 | Substitute Opinion | AFFIRMED | |
06/24/1986 | Submission | | |
05/15/1986 | Mtn.for en banc consideration DISPOSED-APE,ANT | GRANTED | |
05/08/1986 | Opinion issued | AFFIRMED | |
05/08/1986 | Opinion issued | AFFIRMED | |
03/20/1986 | Submission | | |
02/04/1986 | Case ready to be set | | |
01/13/1986 | AM CUR, OTHER, | | |
12/12/1985 | AM CUR, OTHER, | | |
11/27/1985 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
11/19/1985 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
10/24/1985 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
10/18/1985 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
09/25/1985 | Record Filed (Both records FILED) | | |
07/05/1985 | Letter from atty with address change | | |
07/05/1985 | Notice of Appeal FILED - APP | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/14/1986 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Criminal - State of Texas | John B. Holmes, Jr. |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Criminal - Appellant | Hon. Robert Rangel |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Criminal - State of Texas | Timothy G. Taft |
Trial Court Information
230th District Court
Harris
Honorable JOE KEGANS
417,000
2 yrs. TDC