Case: 04-03-00028-CR
04-03-00028-CR
01/09/2003
Poss of Marihuana
Omar Guerrero
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/20/2005 | Mandate Executed By The Trial Court | | |
01/14/2005 | Mandate received by the trial court | | |
01/13/2005 | Mandate Issued | | |
11/03/2004 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed | |
03/02/2004 | Submitted | | |
02/03/2004 | Submission | Motion or Writ Denied | |
12/11/2003 | Brief Filed | | |
12/11/2003 | Case ready to be set | | |
12/11/2003 | Requests Oral Argument | | |
12/10/2003 | Information regarding cause received | | |
11/13/2003 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
11/10/2003 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
10/10/2003 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disp/Per Curiam/Clerk's Order | Motion or Writ Granted | |
10/09/2003 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
09/10/2003 | Brief Filed | | |
09/10/2003 | Requests Oral Argument | | |
08/11/2003 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
08/04/2003 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
07/10/2003 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
07/07/2003 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
06/03/2003 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disp/Per Curiam/Clerk's Order | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/02/2003 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
05/12/2003 | Reporters Record Filed | | |
03/12/2003 | Notification Of Late Reporter's Record | Motion or Writ Granted | |
03/10/2003 | Notification Of Late Reporter's Record | | |
02/21/2003 | Notification Of Late Reporter's Record | Motion or Writ Granted | |
02/04/2003 | Clerks Record Filed | | |
01/30/2003 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |
01/30/2003 | Notification Of Late Reporter's Record | | |
01/27/2003 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |
01/09/2003 | Staff Attorney has been assigned to the case | | |
01/09/2003 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
01/03/2003 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
12/05/2002 | Date of Sentencing in Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/13/2005 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Guerrero, Omar | Criminal - Appellant | Reginald Van Wade |
The State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Michael Bagley Lee Romero |
Trial Court Information
63rd Judicial District Court
Val Verde
Honorable Thomas F. Lee
9404
9 YEARS TDCJ & $1000 FINE