Case: 02-05-00193-CV
02-05-00193-CV
05/31/2005
Injunction
Western Research & Management, LLC AND Colby L. Harlow and Harlow Capital Management, LLC
Colby L. Harlow and Harlow Capital Management, LLC AND Western Research & Management, LLC
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/03/2006 | Order Entered | | |||||
01/20/2006 | Correspondence from interested entity | | |||||
01/03/2006 | Mandate Issued | | |||||
10/13/2005 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed |
| ||||
10/13/2005 | Motion for Dismissal Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
10/07/2005 | Motion for Dismissal Filed | | |||||
09/23/2005 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
09/22/2005 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief Filed | | |||||
09/06/2005 | Submitted | | |||||
09/06/2005 | Reply Brief Filed | | |||||
09/06/2005 | Supplemental Brief Filed | | |||||
08/15/2005 | Submission | | |||||
08/15/2005 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
08/15/2005 | Brief Filed | | |||||
08/01/2005 | Other Document Received | | |||||
07/15/2005 | Brief Filed | | |||||
07/06/2005 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
06/29/2005 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |||||
06/17/2005 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |||||
06/15/2005 | Sup. Clerk's Record Filed | | |||||
06/14/2005 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||||
06/13/2005 | Appellant's Notice of Appeal | | |||||
06/10/2005 | Exhibits Filed | | |||||
06/10/2005 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |||||
06/02/2005 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |||||
06/02/2005 | Filing Fee Paid | | |||||
05/31/2005 | Appellant's Notice of Appeal | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/03/2006 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Western Research & Management, LLC | Appellant | Timothy E. Malone |
Harlow Capital Management, LLC | Appellee | Gregory P. Laird |
Harlow, Colby L. | Appellee | Gregory P. Laird |
Trial Court Information
348th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Dana M. Womack
348-210086-05