Case Information: 37998 | |||
Short Caption: | KRIVAC (JOSEPH) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 40027 , 40279 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR001462 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/07/2001 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/07/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 01-09535 | |
07/10/2001 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 01-11569 | |
07/10/2001 | Fast Track Brief | Received Fast Track Statement. | 01-11570 | |
07/10/2001 | Appendix | Received Appendix. | 01-11571 | |
07/11/2001 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed July 10, 2001. The clerk shall file the fast track statement and appendix received on July 10, 2001. | 01-11674 | |
07/11/2001 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 01-11570 | |
07/11/2001 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 01-11571 | |
07/18/2001 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. for motion to extend time to file fast track statement. | 01-12218 | |
07/31/2001 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 01-12935 | |
08/24/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. we "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP01A-MS/DA/RR | 01-14372 | |
09/18/2001 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 01-14680 | |
09/18/2001 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
09/26/2001 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 20, 2001. | 01-14680 |