Case: 07-99-00394-CR
07-99-00394-CR
09/24/1999
Sexual Abuse or Rape of Child
Martinez, Celedonio Gutierrez
The State of Texas
No
9th Court of Appeals
09/24/1999
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
10/04/1999 | Mandate Issued | | |
10/04/1999 | Opinion issued | Dismissed | |
10/04/1999 | Submitted | | |
10/04/1999 | Submission | | |
10/01/1999 | Affidavit Filed | | |
09/27/1999 | Motion for Dismissal Filed | | |
09/24/1999 | Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals | | |
09/24/1999 | Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals | | |
09/03/1999 | Notice of appeal w/form from trial clerk | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Ms. Dorothy Anne Streit |
Martinez, Celedonio Gutierrez | Appellant | Jani J. Maselli |
Trial Court Information
253rd District Court
Liberty
Honorable Chap B. Cain
22626
99 years