Case: 05-0499
05-0499
07/05/2005
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
IN RE UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/07/2020 | Brief from database | Refer to file-stamped date on the document for the actual file date. | ||
07/08/2005 | Response to Petition | Real Parties in Interest | Response to pet. for writ of mandamus filed on behalf of real parties | |
07/05/2005 | Appendix Filed | Relator | appendix attached. | |
07/05/2005 | Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed | Relator | On behalf Union Carbide Corp. | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/07/2020 | Brief from database | Refer to file-stamped date on the document for the actual file date. | ||
07/28/2005 | Case Stored | G02/13-C-1 | | |
07/22/2005 | Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposed | Dismissed | | |
07/22/2005 | Motion for temporary relief disposed | Filing dismissed as moot | Union Carbide's motion emergency temporary relief dismissed as moot | |
07/22/2005 | Motion to dismiss disposed | Filing granted | unopposed motion to dismiss granted | |
07/12/2005 | Motion to dismiss | Unopposed motion to dismiss filed on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation. | | |
07/08/2005 | Response to Petition | Response to pet. for writ of mandamus filed on behalf of real parties | | |
07/05/2005 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | to real parties counsel to inform them of requested response and AW's email address; also spoke w/Hon Bob Shannon (counsel for relator), he anticipates the trial to last till Tues 7/12 or Wed 7/13 of next week. | | |
07/05/2005 | Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response | Response requested to petition for writ of mandamus due n/l/t 10 a.m. on 7/8/05; mlbx rule d/n/a. | ||
07/05/2005 | Motion for temporary relief | Union Carbide's motion emergency temporary relief. | | |
07/05/2005 | Case Record Filed | Record (2 copies received) | | |
07/05/2005 | Appendix Filed | appendix attached. | | |
07/05/2005 | Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed | On behalf Union Carbide Corp. | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
07/28/2005 | Case Stored | Case stored. | G02/13-C-1 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Union Carbide Corporation | Relator | Mr. Kevin M. Jordan The Honorable Bob E. Shannon Ms. Amy Rebecca Lewis Champagne Ms. Sharla J. Frost Mr. Joel B. Locke Mr. James H. Powers Mr. David P. Herrick Mr. Stephen G. Tipps Ms. Amy Douthitt Maddux Mr. Michael G. Terry |
Jenkins, George | Real Party in Interest | Mr. Gregory N. Jones |
Ledbetter, Edward | Real Party in Interest | Mr. Gregory N. Jones |
Dockal, James B. | Real Party in Interest | Mr. Kevin Duane McHargue Mr. Gregory N. Jones Mr. Allen R. Vaught Ms. Charla G. Aldous Mr. Ronald G. Franklin Mr. Christopher J. Panatier Mr. Russell W. Budd |
Court of Appeals Information:
11-05-00213-CV
Denied
___ SW3d ___, 07-01-05
11th Court of Appeals
Honorable William G. (Bud) Arnot, III
Trial Court Information
161st District Court
Ector
Honorable Tryon D. Lewis
B-115,447