judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BLOCK VS. DOSH C/W 32465

Case Information: 31573
Short Caption:BLOCK VS. DOSH C/W 32465Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:31573*, 32465 Related Case(s): 32465
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A310524Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/16/1998 / Manoukian, NoelSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/16/2001How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/22/1997Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Perry & Spann--check no. 0007575.
12/22/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)
12/26/1997Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Larry R. Hicks. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
01/09/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
01/12/1998Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Settlement Judge Larry R. Hicks. He is recusing himself from participation in this matter.
01/12/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, show cause why this matter should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Fn1[We vacate our notice of December 26, 1997, referring this matter to a settlement conference judge.]
01/30/1998MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. re: Dismissal of Appeal for Lack of Jurisdiction.
02/13/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On January 30, 1998, appellant responded to our order and demonstrated that this court has jurisdiction to consider this appeal. This matter shall not be returned to a settlement conference judge. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to comply with the provisions of NRAP 9(a). Appellant shall have 120 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1).
02/25/1998Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. To Court Reporter: Tom Mercer.
04/03/1998TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: Vols. 1 through 8 (Vols. I through VII not 1 through 8) dated 1/13/98, 1/14/98, 1/15/98, 1/16/98, 1/20/98, 1/21/98, 1/22/98. Court Reporter: Tom Mercer.
06/08/1998MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate. Motion to Consolidate and to Establish New Briefing Schedule or Settlement Conference. Nos. 31573, 32465.
07/02/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We grant Appellant's motion to consolidate the above entitled appeals. We hereby consolidate these matters for all appellate purposes. We further assign these consolidated matters to the settlement conference program. We suspend briefing in these consolidated matters pending conclusion of the settlement Judge Earle W. White. The clerk of this court shall issue the appropriate notice to the parties and forward the necessary documents to the settlement judge. Nos. 31573, 32465.
07/07/1998Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Earle W. White, Jr.. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) Nos. 31573, 32465.
09/16/1998Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Settlement Judge Reassignment. New Settlement Judge: Noel Manoukian. (Settlement conference materials forwarded to Judge Manoukian.)
11/24/1998Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.
01/20/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of these consolidated appeals. Court reporter Thomas Mercer shall have 30 days from the date of this order to comply with the provisions of NRAP 9(b) in Docket Number 32465. Appellant shall have 120 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). As these appeals have been consolidated, each party shall raise all issues on appeal in one brief when complying with the briefing schedule. Nos. 31573, 32465.
03/15/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Change of firm name. The law firm of Gillock, Koning, Markley & Killebrew, P.C., has been changed to Gillock, Markley & Killebrew, P.C. immediately. Nos. 31573, 32465.
05/20/1999MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: June 11, 1999. Nos. 31573, 32465.
05/24/1999MotionFiled Response to Motion. Filed Opposition to Motion for Order Extending Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Respondents' Motion for Dismissal of Appeal. (Nos. 31573 & 32466)
06/11/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Nos. 31573, 32465.
06/16/1999MotionFiled Motion. Respondent's Motion for Dismissal of Appeal and Opposition to Moiton for Order Extending Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief. (Nos. 31573 & 32465)
06/18/1999Other Other. Filed Original Affidavit of Daniel F. Polsenberg in Support of Appellant's Motion for Order Extending Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief. (Nos. 31573 & 32466)
07/02/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Nos. 31573, 32465.
07/02/1999MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation. Nos. 31573, 32465.
07/02/1999BriefReceived Opening Brief. Nos. 31573, 32465. Mailed on: 6/29/99.
07/02/1999AppendixReceived Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 28. Nos. 31573, 32465. Mailed on: 6/29/99.
08/02/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time within which to Oppose or Otherwise Challenge Appellant Block's "Motion for Leave to Exceed page Limitation" and "Motion for Order Extending Time to File Opening Brief," and for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Contest Purported Opening Brief and Appendix. Nos. 31573, 32465.
08/12/1999MotionFiled Response to Motion. Partial Opposition to Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time, etc. Nos. 31573, 32465.
08/18/1999MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Strike Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix, to Dismiss Appeal, and for Award of Attorney's Fees, Double Costs, and Delay Damages on the Ground of Multiple Procedural Derelictions. (Nos. 31573 & 32465)
08/19/1999Other Other. Filed Supplemental Affidavit of Daniel F. Polsenberg in Support of Appellant's Partial Opposition to Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time. (Nos. 31573 & 32465)
08/25/1999Other Other. Filed Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Strike Appellant's Opening Brief Etc. (nos. 31573 & 32465)
08/27/1999MotionFiled Motion. Filed Motion for Leave to file Reply Memorandum in Support of "Motion to Strike Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix, to Dismiss Appeal, and for Award of Attorney's Fees, Double Costs, and Delay Damages on the Ground of Multiple Procedural Derelictions." (nos. 31573 & 32465)
08/27/1999Other Other. Received Reply Memorandum in Support of "Motion to Strike Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix, to Dismiss Appeal, and for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Double Costs, and Delay Damages on the Ground of Proceedural Derelictions. Nos. 31573 & 32465. RETURNED UNFILED 6/2/00.
09/07/1999MotionFiled Motion. Appellant's Motion for Leave to File Amended Opposition and to Strike Portion of Respondents' Proposed Reply Prior to its filing. Nos. 31573, 32465
09/07/1999Other Other. Received Amended Opposition to Respondents' Motion to Strike Appellant's Opening Brief, etc. Nos. 31573 & 32465. RETURNED UNFILED 6/2/00.
09/13/1999Other Other. Filed Opposition to "Appellant's Motion for Leave to file Amended Opposition and to Strike Portions of Respondents' Proposed Reply prior to Filing". Nos. 31573 & 32465.
09/22/1999Other Other. Received Second Amended Opposition to Respondents' Motion to Strike Appellant's Opening Brief, etc. Nos. 31573 & 32465. RETURNED UNFILED 6/2/00.
09/22/1999Other Other. Filed Motion for: (1) Leave to File a Second Amended Brief; and (2) an Order Striking from the Record on Appeal, all Reference to Matters Not Contained in the Record on Appeal. Nos. 31573 & 32465.
09/28/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Filed Order we elect to treat respondents' May 24, 1999, opposition to appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the opening brief as a motion to reconsider our May 20, 1999, order, and we deny respondents' motion. We grant appellant's June 11, 1999, motion and July 2, 1999, motions. 1[We deny as moot respondents' August 2, 1999, motion for an extension of time to file an opposition to appellant's July 2, 1999, motions]. The clerk shall forthwith file the opening brief and appendix, provisionally submitted on July 2, 1999. Respondents shall, within 30 days from the date of this order, serve and filed the answering brief. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). We defer ruling on the remaining motions filed in this matter. Nos. 31573 & 32465.
09/28/1999BriefFiled Opening Brief. Nos. 31573, 32465.
09/28/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 28 (filed in no. 31573). Nos. 31573, 32465.
10/04/1999MotionFiled Response to Motion. Respondent's Opposition to "Motion for: (1) Leave to File Second Amended Brief; and (2) an Order Striking from the Record on Appeal all Reference to Matters Not Contained in the Record on Appeal." Nos. 31573 & 32465.
10/25/1999MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: 11/29/99. Nos. 31573, 32465.
10/25/1999MotionFiled Motion. Respondents' Motion to Require Transmission of Original Exhibits, or Copies, for Inclusion in Appendix at Appellant's Cost, and Motion to Consider Failure to Transmit Such Exhibits as Further Ground for Dismissal and/or Sanctions. Nos. 31573 & 32465.
11/02/1999MotionFiled Response to Motion. Appellant's Response to Respondents' Motion to Require Transmission of Original Exhibits, Etc. Nos. 31573 & 32465.
11/18/1999Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from attorney Gerald Gillock requesting this court's action on motion to transmit exhibits filed on October 25, 1999. Nos. 31573 & 32465.
11/29/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Nos. 31573, 32465.
12/30/1999MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File Brief in Excess of 30 pages, to wit: 97 pages. Nos. 31573, 32465.
12/30/1999BriefReceived Answering Brief. Mailed on: 12/28/99. Nos. 31573, 32465.
12/30/1999AppendixReceived Appendix to Answering Brief. Nos. 31573, 32465.
02/02/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Nos. 31573, 32465.
03/03/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Second Request). Nos. 31573, 32465.
03/09/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Respondents' Opposition to Appellant's Second Request for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 31573 & 32465.
04/03/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Third Request). Nos. 31573, 32465.
04/04/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Respondents' Opposition to Appellant's Third Request for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 31573 & 32465.
04/25/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Fourth Request.) Nos. 31573. 32465.
04/27/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Respondents' Opposition to Appellant's Fourth Request for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 31573 & 32465.
05/03/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Fifth Request.) Nos. 31573, 32465.
05/05/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Respondents' Opposition to Appellant's Fifth Request for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 31573 & 32465.
05/05/2000MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation. Nos. 31573, 32465.
05/05/2000BriefReceived Reply Brief. Mailed on: 5/5/00. Nos. 31573, 32465.
06/02/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On September 28, 1999, we entered an order resolving appellant's motions for extensions of time to file the opening brief. Since entry of the September 28, 1999, order, the parties have filed myriad additional motions, responses, oppositions and affidavits related to the briefing of these consolidated appeals. The clerk of this court shall file respondents' answering brief and appendix received on December 30, 1999, and appellant's reply brief received on May 5, 2000. We grant respondent's October 25, 1999, motion to require the transmission of original exhibits or copies for inclusion in the appellate court record. The clerk of the district court shall forthwith certify and transmit to this court all of the original exhibits which were received in evidence during the trials that resulted in the verdicts now on appeal. As briefing of these appeals is now completed we deny all other pending motions filed in these appeals. fn2 [The clerk of this court shall return, unfiled, any received documents which the parties sought leave to file throught the motions we have denied in this order.] This court wil disregard any matters in the parties' briefs or the appellate court record which are not supported by proper citation or that are otherwise irrelevant to the issues on appeal. Nos. 31573, 32465.
06/02/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Nos. 31573, 32465. (Brief in no. 31573)
06/02/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Nos. 31573, 32465. (Appendix in no. 31573)
06/02/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Nos. 31573, 32465. (Brief in no. 31573)
06/02/2000Other Other. Returned, unfiled, with letter, to the Beckley firm: "Amended Opposition to Respondents' Motion to Strike Appellant's Opening Brief, etc." received September 7, 1999, and "Second Amended Opposition to Respondents' Motion to Strike Appellant's Opening Brief, etc." received September 22, 1999. Nos. 31573 & 32465
06/02/2000Other Other. Returned, unfiled, with letter to the Galatz firm: original Reply Memorandum in Support of "Motion to Strike Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix, to Dismiss Appeal, and for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Double Costs, and Delay Damages on the Ground of Procedural Derelictions" received August 27, 1999. Nos. 31573 & 32465.
07/20/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On June 6, 2000, this court entered an order which, in part, granted respondents' motion filed October 25, 1999. On July 14, 2000, this court received from the district court clerk a large box of assorted original exhibits including non-documentary exhibits. The clerk of this court shall forthwith return to the district court clerk all exhibits in these consolidated appeals which were received by this court on July 14, 2000. Respondents shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file a supplemental motion to transmit exhibits and shall specify precisely and individually each original exhibit which respondents desire to have transmitted to this court. Nos. 31573, 32465. 00-12512
07/20/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to the Clark County Clerk: pursuant to the Order filed today, returned the original Exhibits received on July 14, 2000. Nos. 31573, 32465.
08/04/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Return of Exhibits. Nos. 31573, 32465. 00-13513
10/10/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, respondents have not filed a supplemental motion. It appears that respondents do not require the transmissin of exhibits from the district court for consideration in this appeal. The briefing of this appeal is deemed completed. Nos. 31573, 32465. 00-17891
03/16/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. Nos. 31573/32465. (01-04776) 01-04776
03/16/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Southern Nevada Panel. SNP01A-CY/ML/NB. Nos. 31573/32465
03/21/2001MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authorities. Nos. 31573/32465. 01-04966
04/03/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On March 16, 2001, this court entered an order submitting these consolidated appeals for decision upon the briefs. On March 21, 2001, respondents filed a 'Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authorities.' Because respondents' 'supplemental authorities' do not appear to comply with the intent of NRAP 31(d), and no good cause appearing, we deny respondents' motion. The clerk of this court shall return, unfiled, the document entitled, 'Respondents' Supplemental Authorities Filed Pursuant to NRAP 31(d),' that was received on March 21, 2001. We remind the parties that this court will disregard any matters improperly included in the briefs. Nos. 31573/32465. (01-05693) 01-05693
04/03/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to the Galatz firm: returned original and one copy of the Respondents' Supplemental Authorities Filed Pursuant to NRAP 31(d), received on March 21, 2001. Nos. 31573/32465 (01-04967).
05/16/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that the district court properly denied appellant's request for a new trial on damages. "AFFIRMED." SNP01A-CY/ML/NB Nos. 31573/32465 01-08095
06/12/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-08122
06/12/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/05/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 19, 2001. 01-08122