judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ANDREW JOHN YELLOWBEAR, JR. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-246)
Case Number:06-246Case Docketed On:10/24/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Hot Springs CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:ANDREW JOHN YELLOWBEAR, JR. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:ANDREW JOHN YELLOWBEAR, JR., Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantAndrew John Yellowbear Jr.Sylvia Lee Hackl
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
David L. Delicath

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Jury Instructions, Criminal Law -Prosecutorial Misconduct, Indian Law, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 4
Citation:174 P.3d 1270

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/24/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/24/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/24/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/04/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/04/2006Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/08/2006Correspondence - Incoming - received copy of letter from court reporter regarding trial exhibits.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
01/19/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/19/2007Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/14/2007Motion - Supplement the recordMotionSupplement the recordFinal
02/22/2007Correspondence - Incoming other - letter from appellant (treated as motion for new counsel).CorrespondenceIncoming otherFinal
03/05/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/06/2007Order - Grant - third extension of timeOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
03/06/2007Order - Denying request for appointment of substitute appellate counselOrderDenyFinal
03/06/2007Order - Granting motion to supplement record on appeal.OrderGrantFinal
03/13/2007Correspondence - Incoming other - received letter from appellant regarding submitting additional material to the court.CorrespondenceIncoming otherFinal
03/15/2007Correspondence - Outgoing other - responded to appellant regarding his letter of 3/9/07, indicating that the court cannot receive additional materials that were not before the trial court.CorrespondenceOutgoing otherFinal
03/20/2007Correspondence - Incoming other - Received additional correspondence and materials from appellant. Marked received and returned copy to appellant. No further action.CorrespondenceIncoming otherFinal
04/19/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/19/2007Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellant. No further allowed.OrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/07/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy on disk and copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
05/09/2007Motion - Withdrawal of counsel by Tina N. Kerin, Appellate CounselMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
05/09/2007Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance for Sylvia Lee Hackl to appear on behalf of appellantNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
05/09/2007Correspondence - Incoming - received copy of letter from Sylvia Hackl to court reporter regarding return of exhibits.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
05/10/2007Order - Granting withdrawal of counselOrderGranting withdrawal of counselFinal
05/11/2007Correspondence - Incoming - received letter from appellant regarding whether or not brief had been filed and responded.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
06/20/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk and designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
07/06/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/09/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/12/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting, David Delicath.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/12/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting, Sylvia Lee Hackl.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/18/2007Notice-Incoming - Designation of record (Amended)Notice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
07/19/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, fourteen volumes. Volumes I - IX, Original Papers; Volume X, Jury Instructions and Confidential Files; Volume XI, Trial Transcripts Vols. I - XI; Volume XII, Trial Transcripts, Vols. XII - XXIV; Volume XIII, Motion Hearing Transcripts; Volume XIV, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/19/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
08/13/2007Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
08/15/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Sylvia Lee Hackl for appellant; David L. Delicath, Senior Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
08/15/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
11/21/2007Correspondence - Incoming - received letter from appellant requesting transcript of oral argument tape, and responded.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
11/28/2007Event - Phone Call - See case notes, call Tenth Circuit when opinion is publishedEventPhone CallFinal
01/14/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, but remanded for amendment of the Judgment and Sentence. Chief Justice Voigt writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/30/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/30/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/30/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/30/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/04/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cards. Four (4) cards returned, three signed for 1/31/08 by Linda Harris and one signed for 2/1/08 by T. Cornella.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal