judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

O. P. LOCKHART, CHAIRMAN, ET AL. v. GUARDIAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF TEXAS, ET AL.

Case: A-99
A-99
03/17/1944
MISC PETITION
O. P. LOCKHART, CHAIRMAN, ET AL.
GUARDIAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF TEXAS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/26/1944Appellees' Brief filed
04/04/1944Appellant's Brief filed
03/17/1944Exhibits in case/cause filed
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/28/1944Letter Filed
05/10/1944Order from Lower Court filed
04/26/1944Appellees' Brief filed
04/12/1944Notice of rehearing, etc.
04/04/1944Appellant's Brief filed
03/17/1944Exhibits in case/cause filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Guardian Life Insurance Company of Texas, et al.Appellee
O. P. Lockhart, Chairman, et al.Appellant
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information