judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MORRIS (NATHANIEL LEE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 32409
Short Caption:MORRIS (NATHANIEL LEE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 32464 , 42963 , 63023 , 65235
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C113358Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/12/1998How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/26/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
05/26/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
07/09/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Within 120 days from the date of this order the clerk of the district court shall transmit to this court a certified copy of the complete trial record in each of the above-identified appeal, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings. 1[The records shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 32316, 32369, 32409, 32410, 32430, 32464, 32471, and 32482.
11/12/1998Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 through 3.
11/12/1998Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
08/17/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order Dismissing Appeal (Docket No. 32409) and Administratively Closing Appeal (Docket No. 32464). fn1[Appellant filed two notices of appeal from the April 28, 1998 order of the district court denying his petition. The clerk of this court inadvertently opened a new appeal in Docket No. 32464 upon receipt of appellant's second notice of appeal. We direct the clerk of this court to administratively close Docket No. 32464.] We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB Nos. 32409, 32464. 00-14373
09/12/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-14438
09/12/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/06/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 2, 2000. 00-14438