judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KAREN CLEAVER-BASCOMBE V. KIMMO KARTANO

Case Information: 10-FM-0784
Short Caption:KAREN CLEAVER-BASCOMBE V. KIMMO KARTANOClassification:Appeals - Family - Support
Lead: 10-FM-0215 Consolidated: 10-FM-0334 , 10-FM-0784
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DRB2599-04Filed Date:06/18/2010

Opening Event Date:06/18/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/14/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:11/08/2010
Argued/Submitted:04/13/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/16/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKaren Cleaver-Bascombe NPro SeN
AppelleeKimmo Kartano N
Sandra G. WilkofNY
Eric H. SingerNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/18/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL 5/4/10 6/1/10 (rt. needed)
06/28/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S)
07/14/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (34 pgs/tape) 5/4/10 proc.
07/14/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (65 pgs/tape) 6/1/10 proc. w/cd
07/14/2010RECORD COMPLETED
07/20/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC)
07/22/2010RECORD INDEX (for all)
08/25/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
08/25/2010APPENDIX attached to Appellant's Brief
09/01/2010APPENDIX (Supplemental) Exhibits 6-Y and 6-R to Brief of Appellant. (Inadvertently separated from submission)
09/22/2010APPEARANCE of Eric Singer on behalf of aple.
09/28/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE AND motion to dismiss
09/28/2010APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION- to combined motion to dismiss and for summary affirmance
09/29/2010TMC - motion to dismiss & for summary affirmance - oppo
10/08/2010RECEIVED - aple's reply to aplt's opposition to combined motions
10/08/2010 ORDERED, SS, that the Clerk shall file APPELLEE'S UNTIMELY LODGED REPLY. It is *****MORE*****
10/08/2010APPELLEE'S REPLY to appellant's motion to dismiss or for summary affirmance
10/08/2010 F/ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IN APPEAL 10FM215 & 10FM334 IS DENIED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IN APPEAL 10FM784 IS DENIED. It is ****MORE*****
10/08/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE APPEAL NOS. 10FM215, 10FM334 & 10FM784 IS GRANTED... It is ****MORE*****
10/08/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION TO STAY consideration of the motion for summary affirmance IS DENIED AS MOOT. It is FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLEE'S CONSOLIDATED BRIEF shall be filed W/N 30 days from the date of this order. (RZGLNB) (jl)
10/20/2010APPELLEE'S MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION to recuse Judges, Wagner, Reid, Newman, Schwelb, Glickman and Steadman
10/29/2010ORDER DENY APLE MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION to its renewal upon calendaring. (ETW)
11/08/2010APPELLEE'S BRIEF
11/08/2010BRIEFS COMPLETED
11/12/2010RECEIVED- corrected aple's brief (motion for leave is needed) sent back
11/17/2010APLE MOTION FOR LV TO FILE AMENDED/CORRECTED BRIEF (did not comply w/rule 27)
11/17/2010RECEIVED - aple's corrected brief.
11/24/2010FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I
11/24/2010APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
12/02/2010ORD GRT APLE MO FOR LV TO FL AMENDED/CORRECTED BRF and the lodged corrected brief is filed. It is F/O that these matters shall be scheduled before a merits division of this court as soon as the calendar permits. (JAC)
12/09/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION TO STRIKE- reply brief
12/13/2010TMC - appellee's motion to strike reply brief
12/16/2010 ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION TO STRIKE REPLY BRIEF IS DENIED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that these matters shall be scheduled before a merits division of this court as soon as the calendar permits. (RD*OBFA) *J OB voted to grant the motion to strike and direct appellant w/n 10 days from the date of the order, to file a reply brief that complies with the rules of this court.
03/02/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
03/08/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT
03/29/2011ORDER DENYING APLT MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT and this matter will be submitted for decision on April 13, 2011, on the record and briefs filed without argument by any party. (JAC)
04/13/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/13/2011SUBMITTED to Judges Ruiz, Kramer, Belson
09/15/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Ruiz, Belson and King)
09/29/2011FiledPetition For Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)
12/09/2011FiledOrder Denying appellant's pro se pet for rehearing en banc
12/16/2011FiledMandate
04/30/2012FiledCopy/Notice Of Petition For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)
05/25/2012FiledMiscellaneous letter from supreme court re: motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Appellant)
10/04/2012FiledNotice Of Denial Of Pet. For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)