judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SEVEN LAKES DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, L.L.C.; and DAVID W. KUHN v. JOHN MAXSON and MARILYN MAXSON, husband and wife

Case Heading (06-6)
Case Number:06-6Case Docketed On:01/06/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:SEVEN LAKES DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, L.L.C.; and DAVID W. KUHN v. JOHN MAXSON and MARILYN MAXSON, husband and wife
Full Title:SEVEN LAKES DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, L.L.C.; and DAVID W. KUHN, Appellants (Defendants), v. JOHN MAXSON and MARILYN MAXSON, husband and wife, Appellees (Plaintiffs).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantSeven Lakes Development Company, L.L.C.William L. Hiser
Kelly Marie Neville
Lindsay Anne Hoyt
AppellantDavid W. KuhnWilliam L. Hiser
Kelly Marie Neville
Lindsay Anne Hoyt
AppelleeJohn MaxsonGreg Weisz
Devon P. O'Connell
AppelleeMarilyn MaxsonGreg Weisz
Devon P. O'Connell

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2006 WY 136
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/06/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/06/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/06/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/06/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/23/2006Brief - Appellants; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
04/12/2006Brief - Appellees and appendix to brief; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
04/14/2006Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/01/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/11/2006Order - Assignment of judge. Filed order recusing Justice Kite and assigning Judge Norman E. Young.OrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
05/16/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, seven volumes. Volumes I-IV, original papers; volumes V-VI, transcripts; volume VII, exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/16/2006Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/23/2006Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before Chief Justice Hill, Justices Golden, Voigt and Burke, and Young, DJ (William L. Hiser and Kelly Neville Heck, argument by Mr. Hiser for appellants; M. Gregory Weisz for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
05/23/2006Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
10/27/2006Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Chief Justice Voigt writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/14/2006Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/14/2006Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/14/2006Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/15/2006Service - Certified mail signature return cards (3).ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
11/17/2006Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
11/17/2006Notice-Outgoing - Deficient pleadings. Returned appellees bill of costs - unfiled - not timely filed.Notice-OutgoingDeficient pleadingsFinal