judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-65
A-65
02/11/1944
MISC PETITION
TEXAS OSAGE COOPERATIVE ROYALTY POOL, ET AL.
M. M. GARCIA
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/16/1944Reply to ResponsePetitioner
03/09/1944Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/22/1944Reply to ResponsePetitioner
02/19/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/16/1944Reply to Response
03/13/1944Response to Motion filed
03/09/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/22/1944Reply to Response
02/19/1944Response to Petition
02/11/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Osage Cooperative Royalty Pool, et al.Petitioner
M. M. GarciaRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information