judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JOHN D. BRADLEY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0108)
Case Number:S-07-0108Case Docketed On:05/15/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Sentencing 6-10-101 - 6-10-301
Short Title:JOHN D. BRADLEY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JOHN D. BRADLEY, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJohn D. BradleyDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
D. Michael Pauling
Terry L. Armitage

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/15/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/15/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/15/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/05/2007Order - Convert to petition (untimely petition)OrderConvert to petitionFinal
06/29/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/03/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/09/2007Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
07/10/2007Order - Dismiss - voluntaryOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
07/10/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/16/2007Notice-Incoming - Waiver of appeal (original copy)Notice-IncomingWaiver of appealFinal