Case: 95-1045
95-1045
10/19/1995
App Writ of Error
DONALD AUERBACH
DALLAS AREA RAPID TRANSIT and DOUGLAS S. PERRY d/b/a THE PERRY COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/11/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
09/10/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
11/13/1995 | Reply to Response | Respondent | | |
11/06/1995 | Reply to Response | Respondent | behalf of Douglas S. Perry | |
10/19/1995 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/11/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
09/10/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
08/26/1996 | Record returned to Court of Appeals | Case stored | | |
06/14/1996 | Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks. | Filing granted | motion to strike cross-points granted | |
06/14/1996 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | Denied | | |
12/13/1995 | Reply to Response to Motion | Dallas Area Rapid Transi's reply to mo/strike | | |
12/08/1995 | Notice requesting filing fee | reply to motion to strike - $5.00; to Robert L. Sims | | |
12/04/1995 | Reply to Response to Motion | "Respondents Douglas Perry response to Petitioners motion to strike Respondent Cross-Points and portions of reply points" | | |
11/22/1995 | Motion to Strike filed | cross-points and portions of reply points for woj... | | |
11/13/1995 | Reply to Response | | | |
11/10/1995 | Notice requesting filing fee | $5 Reply to App; behalf of Dallas Area Rapid Transit | | |
11/08/1995 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
11/06/1995 | MET to file reply disposed of | Filing granted | reply of Dallas Area Rapid Transit due 11-08-95 | |
11/06/1995 | Reply to Response | behalf of Douglas S. Perry | | |
10/19/1995 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
08/26/1996 | Case Stored | Case stored. | Record returned |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
PERRY, DOUGLAS S. | Respondent | Mr. Robert M. Clark |
THE PERRY COMPANY | Respondent | Mr. F. Michael Seay |
AUERBACH, DONALD | Petitioner | Mr. David E. Mittle |
DALLAS AREA RAPID TRANSIT | Respondent | Mr. Paul D. Jones Mr. Robert L. Sims Mr. Kevin B. Wiggins Mr. Roland Castaneda |
Court of Appeals Information:
05-94-01207-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
RULE 90, 07-26-95
5th Court of Appeals
Honorable ED KINKEADE
Trial Court Information
160th District Court
Dallas
Honorable Lynn Skipworth Hunt
93-08046-H