Case: 07-85-00239-CV
07-85-00239-CV
09/03/1985
Contract
Pierson, Dennis dba Dennis the Price Menace Liquors
Val-Pak of Amarillo
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/27/1987 | Mandate Issued | | |
12/11/1986 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded | |
04/09/1986 | Submitted | | |
04/09/1986 | Submission | | |
03/18/1986 | Letter of Inquiry filed | | |
03/17/1986 | Brief Filed | | |
03/17/1986 | Case ready to be set | | |
02/18/1986 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disp. | GRANT | |
02/14/1986 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |
01/13/1986 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disp. | GRANT | |
01/10/1986 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |
12/20/1985 | Brief Filed | | |
11/05/1985 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disp. | GRANT | |
11/04/1985 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |
10/07/1985 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disp. | GRANT | |
10/04/1985 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |
09/03/1985 | Do not use | | |
09/03/1985 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/27/1987 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 1
Potter
Honorable David L. Gleason
34,394