Case: 01-08-00899-CV
01-08-00899-CV
11/03/2008
Prohibition
In re Lena Jo Barber and Baird, Crews, Schiller & Whitaker, P.C.
Yes
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
11/03/2008 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed | Relator | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/29/2008 | Motion for rehearing due | | |||||
12/11/2008 | Memorandum opinion issued | Deny petition for writ of mandamus |
| ||||
12/10/2008 | Submitted | | |||||
11/25/2008 | Response filed | | |||||
11/18/2008 | Response filed | | |||||
11/12/2008 | Response filed | | |||||
11/04/2008 | Motion for emergency relief filed | | |||||
11/04/2008 | Order entered | Deny motion | | ||||
11/04/2008 | Motion to stay disposed | Deny motion | | ||||
11/03/2008 | Record filed | | |||||
11/03/2008 | Fee paid | | |||||
11/03/2008 | Fee paid | | |||||
11/03/2008 | Motion to stay filed | | |||||
11/03/2008 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/09/2009 | Retention | Strip file 60 days after issuance of mandate |
12/11/2014 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Cangelosi, Dorothea | Real party in interest | John C. Juravich John Edward Maher |
Barber, Lena Jo | Relator | Kenneth R. Valka |
Baird, Crews, Schiller & Whitaker, P.C. | Relator | Darlene Payne Smith |
Trial Court Information
County Court
Waller
Honorable June Jackson
P0577