Case: 01-85-00726-CR
01-85-00726-CR
08/21/1985
Assault & battery
Gaines, Patrick Lyn
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
08/05/1986 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
07/21/1986 | No petition for review or writ of error was filed | | |
06/20/1986 | Motion for rehearing was not filed | | |
06/05/1986 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
05/28/1986 | Submitted | | |
04/29/1986 | Submission | | |
04/23/1986 | Brief filed | | |
03/27/1986 | Brief filed | | |
03/06/1986 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
02/25/1986 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
01/30/1986 | Record filed | | |
10/10/1985 | Motion to extend time to file state of facts disp | Grant motion | |
09/26/1985 | Motion to extend time to file statement of facts | | |
08/21/1985 | Notice of appeal filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/05/1986 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State | Criminal - State of Texas | Linda West |
State | Criminal - State of Texas | John B. Holmes |
State | Criminal - Appellant | Hon. Harry Schneider |
State | Criminal - State of Texas | Patricia N. Saum |
Trial Court Information
182nd District Court
Harris
428,722
20 years TDC