Case: 12-01-00275-CV
12-01-00275-CV
10/11/2001
Mandamus
In Re: Eastman Chemical Company, Mustang Pipeline Company and Fluor Daniel Williams Brothers
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/18/2012 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
11/13/2001 | Case stored | | |
11/13/2001 | Motion for rehearing was not filed | | |
10/29/2001 | Relator`s Petition for Writ of Mandamus Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
10/29/2001 | Order disposing of a case | Motion or Writ Denied | |
10/22/2001 | Response to Motion Filed | | |
10/15/2001 | Motion for Temporary or Emergency Relief | Motion or Writ Granted | |
10/15/2001 | Mot for time to file response disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
10/12/2001 | Motion to Extend Time to File Response | | |
10/11/2001 | letter requesting response in interlocutory appeal | | |
10/11/2001 | Disposition of Motion | Motion or Writ Granted | |
10/11/2001 | Record Filed | | |
10/11/2001 | No Description Available. | | |
10/11/2001 | Motion for Temporary or Emergency Relief | | |
10/11/2001 | Petition for Writ of Mandamus Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/18/2012 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Eastman Chemical Company, Mustang Pipeline Company & Fluor Daniel Williams Brothers | Relator | Mr. Ken W. Good Ms. Christie L. Ryan Mr. Billy D. Anderson |
Gossett, J. Clay | Respondent | Judge J. Clay Gossett |
Jeanie C. Moore, et al | Real party in interest | Mr. Ron Adkison |
Trial Court Information
4th District Court
Rusk
Honorable J. Clay Gossett
98-283