Case: 08-85-00095-CR
08-85-00095-CR
04/09/1985
Other Felony
Valles, Robert
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
09/29/1989 | Shuck purged | | |
12/12/1986 | Mandate Issued | | |
12/12/1986 | Mandate Issued | | |
10/20/1986 | Filing Fee Requested | | |
09/25/1986 | Filing Fee Requested | | |
07/16/1986 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
07/16/1986 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
05/30/1986 | Submitted | | |
05/30/1986 | Submission | | |
05/30/1986 | Submitted | | |
04/16/1986 | Submission | | |
03/26/1986 | Case ready to be set | | |
02/24/1986 | Filing Fee Requested | | |
02/24/1986 | Record filed. | | |
01/14/1986 | No description available. | | |
12/10/1985 | Waiver of brief, list of authorities, etc. | | |
11/13/1985 | Order entered | | |
11/08/1985 | Response to inquiry filed. | | |
11/05/1985 | Miscellaneous Letter of Inquiry | | |
07/10/1985 | Motion to Withdraw as appeal atty disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/25/1985 | Motion to Withdraw as appeal atty filed | | |
06/21/1985 | No description available. | | |
06/12/1985 | No description available. | | |
04/29/1985 | No description available. | | |
04/11/1985 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
04/09/1985 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
04/09/1985 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
12/12/1986 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Unknown | Criminal - Appellant | |
Unknown | Criminal - Appellant | Robert Valles |
Unknown | Criminal - State of Texas | Hon. Steve W. Simmons |
Trial Court Information
120th District Court
El Paso
41674
4 years TDC