judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROBERT W. HORN v. ALBERT WOOSTER and TERRANCE DUDDY

Case Heading (06-195)
Case Number:06-195Case Docketed On:08/24/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:United States District Court for the District of WyomingCase Type:Original Proceeding - Certified Question - United States District Court, District of Wyoming
Short Title:ROBERT W. HORN v. ALBERT WOOSTER and TERRANCE DUDDY
Full Title:ROBERT W. HORN and ROBERT W. HORN, P.C., Appellants (Defendants), v. ALBERT WOOSTER and TERRANCE DUDDY, Appellees (Plaintiffs).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRobert W. HornWeston W. Reeves
Anna M. Reeves Olson
AppellantRobert W. Horn, P.C.Weston W. Reeves
Anna M. Reeves Olson
AppelleeAlbert WoosterSteve C.M. Aron
AppelleeTerrance DuddySteve C.M. Aron

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 120
Citation:165 P.3d 69

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/24/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/24/2006Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Order certifying question Rule 11Rulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOrder certifying question Rule 11Final
08/24/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/22/2006Order - Certified Question - Accepting questions/briefingOrderCertified Question - Accepting questions/briefingFinal
11/08/2006Brief - Appellants; received copy of brief on CDBriefAppellantFinal
12/11/2006Brief - Appellees; requested file stamped brief returned--no copy provided, no stamped envelopeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/26/2006Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/15/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Weston W. Reeves for appellant: C.M. "Steve" Aron for appellee) and taken under advisementEventOral argument presentedFinal
02/15/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
08/01/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order answering first question in the affirmative and second question in the negative. Justice Kite writing for the Court. Justice Burke filed a dissenting opinionOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/17/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal