judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

JEFFERSON COUNTY, TEXAS v. GROVER SELLERS, ATTORNEY GENERAL OF TEXAS, ET AL.

Case: A-103
A-103
03/18/1944
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
JEFFERSON COUNTY, TEXAS
GROVER SELLERS, ATTORNEY GENERAL OF TEXAS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/03/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
05/03/1944Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/02/1944Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/02/1944Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/02/1944Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/02/1944Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/02/1944Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/02/1944Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/02/1944Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/02/1944Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/29/1944Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/21/1944Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/29/1944Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedRelator
03/18/1944Brief in Support of PetitionRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/03/1944Response to Petition
05/03/1944Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/02/1944Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/02/1944Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/02/1944Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/02/1944Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/02/1944Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/02/1944Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/02/1944Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/02/1944Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/29/1944Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/21/1944Amicus Curiae Brief received
03/29/1944Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed
03/18/1944Brief in Support of Petition
03/18/1944Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Goldsmith and Bagby, et al.Amicus Curiae
Grover Sellers, Attorney General of Texas, et al.Respondent
R. F. ChapmanAmicus Curiae
C. F. GettysAmicus Curiae
Great National Life Insurance CompanyAmicus Curiae
Fulbright, Crooker, Freeman and Bates, et al.Amicus Curiae
Rosser J. Coke and George Waverly BriggsAmicus Curiae
JEFFERSON COUNTY, TEXASRelator
D. Y. McDanielAmicus Curiae
Eugene de BogoryAmicus Curiae
Vinson, Elkins, Weems and Francis, et al.Amicus Curiae
Black, Graves and StaytonAmicus Curiae
Pat DoughertyAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information